Dec 27 2018 | Application (18A688) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 8, 2019 to March 9, 2019, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions |
Jan 02 2019 | Application (18A688) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until March 9, 2019. |
| |
Mar 11 2019 | Motion (18M126) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal filed. |
| |
Mar 11 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 15, 2019) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixProof of Service |
Mar 20 2019 | MOTION (18M126) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019. |
| |
Apr 15 2019 | Motion (18M126) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal Granted. |
| |
May 15 2019 | Brief of respondent Richard Jennings in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentMain Document |
May 29 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019. |
| |
Jun 06 2019 | Reply of petitioner Carman L. Deck filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Jun 17 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
| |