Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-877
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-877
Title:Frederick L. Allen, et al., Petitioners
v.
Roy A. Cooper, III, Governor of North Carolina, et al.
Docketed:January 8, 2019
Linked with 18A412
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1522, 17-1602)
   Decision Date:July 10, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 9, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 18 2018Application (18A412) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 7, 2018 to January 6, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 19 2018Application (18A412) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 6, 2019.
Jan 04 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 7, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2019Waiver of right of respondents Roy A. Cooper, III, Governor of North Carolina, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 07 2019Brief amicus curiae of Ralph Oman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2019Brief amici curiae of David Nimmer, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 07 2019Brief amicus curiae of Recording Industry Association of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Feb 19 2019Response Requested. (Due March 21, 2019)
Feb 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 21, 2019 to April 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 22, 2019.
Apr 22 2019Brief of respondents Roy A. Cooper, III, Governor of North Carolina, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2019Reply of petitioners Frederick L. Allen, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019.
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
Jun 03 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jun 18 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Frederick L. Allen, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 24 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Jun 24 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Frederick L. Allen, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jun 24 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Roy A. Cooper, III, Governor of North Carolina, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jun 26 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 6, 2019. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 20, 2019.
Jul 08 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, November 5, 2019.
Aug 06 2019Brief of petitioners Frederick L. Allen, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Association of the Bar of the City of New York in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Oracle America, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Ralph Oman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Brief amici curiae of Public Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Software & Information Industry Association.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Brief amici curiae of American Society of Media Photographers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Brief amici curiae of Recording Industry Association of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Brief amici curiae of The Copyright Alliance; The Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Dow Jones & Company, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 13 2019Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 03 2019CIRCULATED
Sep 16 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit.
Sep 17 2019Record received from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER. The record is complete, there are no sealed materials, paper filings, or exhibits in this record.
Sep 20 2019Brief of respondents Roy A. Cooper, III, Governor of North Carolina, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2019Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Brief amici curiae of Association of Public and Land-Grant Universities, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Brief amici curiae of American Library Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Brief amici curiae of State of West Virginia and 30 Other States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Brief amicus curiae of Professor Simone Rose filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2019Reply of petitioners Frederick L. Allen, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Derek L. Shaffer
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
1300 I Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

derekshaffer@quinnemanuel.com
(202) 538-8000
Party name: Frederick L. Allen, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew W. Sawchak
    Counsel of Record
North Carolina Dept. of Justice
P.O. Box 629
Raleigh, NC 27602

msawchak@ncdoj.gov
(919) 716-6400
Party name: Roy A. Cooper, III, Governor of North Carolina, et al.
Other
Jonathan Band
    Counsel of Record
Jonathan Band PLLC
21 Dupont Circle NW Suite 800
Washington, DC 20036

jband@policybandwidth.com
2022965675
Party name: American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries, Association of Research Libraries, Society of American Archivists, Software Preservation Network
Trevor Stephen Cox
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
Riverfront Plaza - East Tower
951 East Byrd Street
Richmond, VA 23219

TCox@HuntonAK.com
804-788-7221
Party name: Law Professors
Andrew Harry Erteschik
    Counsel of Record
Poyner Spruill LLP
P.O. Box 1801
Raleigh, NC 27602-1801

aerteschik@poynerspruill.com
919-783-2895
Party name: Simone Rose
Elaine Janet Goldenberg
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Street, NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

elaine.goldenberg@mto.com
202-220-1100
Party name: Recording Industry Association of America
William Scott Hastings
    Counsel of Record
Locke Lord LLP
2200 Ross Ave.
Suite 2800
Dallas, TX 75201-6776

shastings@lockelord.com
(214) 740-8537
Party name: David Nimmer, Ernest Young, and Michael Bynum
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts LLP
1299 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

scott.keller@bakerbotts.com
2026397700
Party name: Association of Public and Land-Grant Universities and Association of American Universities
Donald William Rupert
    Counsel of Record
Marshall, Gerstein & Borun LLP
6300 Willis Tower
233 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

drupert@marshallip.com
3124746300
Party name: Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
1900 Kanawha Blvd E, Bldg 1 Rm 26E
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
3045582021
Party name: State of West Virginia and 30 Other States
Melissa Arbus Sherry
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

melissa.sherry@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: Ralph Oman
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: The Copyright Alliance; The Chamber of Commerce of the United States
Kelsi Brown Corkran
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

kcorkran@orrick.com
202-339-8400
Party name: Oracle America, Inc.
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
James Robert Klaiber
    Counsel of Record
Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP
One Battery Park Plaza - 12th Floor
New York, NY 10004

james.klaiber@hugheshubbard.com
212-837-6000
Party name: The Association of The Bar of the City of New York
Robert P. LoBue
    Counsel of Record
Patterson, Belknap, Webb et al
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

rplobue@pbwt.com
2123362000
Party name: Dow Jones & Company, Inc.
Thomas Blake MaddreyMaddrey PLLC
901 Main Street, Suite 6530
Dallas, TX 75202

tbm@maddreypllc.com
214-969-2539
Party name: American Society of Media Photographers; National Press Photographers Association
John Matthew DeWeese Williams
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP
1818 N. Street NW, 8th Floor
Washington, DC 20036

mxw@msk.com
202-355-7900
Party name: Software & Information Industry Association
Ernest A. Young
    Counsel of Record
3208 Fox Terrace Drive.
Apex, NC 27502

young@law.duke.edu
9193607718
Party name: Public Law Scholars

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543