Docket for 18-8429 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 07 2019 | Application (18A721) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 10, 2019 to March 11, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 14 2019 | Application (18A721) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 11, 2019. | | | Mar 11 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 15, 2019) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service | Apr 02 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 15, 2019 to May 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 04 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 15, 2019. | | | May 06 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 15, 2019 to June 14, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 08 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 14, 2019. | | | Jun 14 2019 | Brief of respondent Lorie Davis in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 05 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. | | | Sep 24 2019 | Reply of petitioner Tracy Beatty filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|