Docket for 18-8419 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 25 2019 | Application (18A773) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 27, 2019 to February 26, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions | Jan 28 2019 | Application (18A773) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 26, 2019. | | | Feb 26 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 12, 2019) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service | Apr 02 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 12, 2019 to May 13, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 04 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 13, 2019. | | | May 06 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 13, 2019 to June 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 08 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 12, 2019. | | | Jun 12 2019 | Brief of respondent Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. | | Proof of ServiceMain Document | Jun 27 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. | | | Aug 27 2019 | Reply of petitioner Fabian Hernandez filed. DISTRIBUTED | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|