SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-8409 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-8409 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Anthony Mungin, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
March 14, 2019
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC17-815)
Decision Date:
November 15, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
December 11, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 11 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 15, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Apr 04 2019
Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 18 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 13 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Todd Gerald Scher
Counsel of Record
Law Office of Todd G. Scher, P.L.
1722 Sheridan Street
Suite 346
Hollywood, FL 33020
tscher@msn.com
7542632349
Party name: Anthony Mungin
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32309
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##