Docket for 18-825
|
Dec 21 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 1, 2019) | | PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 10 2019 | Waiver of City of Tupelo Mississippi and Tyler Cook of right to respond not accepted for filing. (January 16, 2019) | | | Jan 11 2019 | Waiver of right of respondents City of Tupelo Mississippi and Tyler Cook to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 23 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019. | | | Feb 19 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|