Nov 07 2018 | Application (18A508) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 6, 2018 to February 4, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service |
Nov 13 2018 | Application (18A508) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 4, 2019. |
| |
Feb 04 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 11, 2019) |
| PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Mar 05 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 11, 2019 to April 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Mar 06 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 10, 2019. |
| |
Mar 11 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 10, 2019 to May 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Mar 12 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 10, 2019. |
| |
May 03 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 10, 2019 to June 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
May 03 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 10, 2019. |
| |
Jun 10 2019 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
| Proof of ServiceMain Document |
Jun 25 2019 | Reply of petitioner Iouri Mikhel filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Jun 27 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. |
| |
Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
| |