Docket for 18-7594 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 07 2018 | Application (18A506) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 25, 2018 to January 24, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions | Nov 09 2018 | Application (18A506) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 24, 2019. | | | Jan 24 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 27, 2019) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Feb 27 2019 | Brief of respondent Benjamin Ford, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOther | Mar 13 2019 | Reply of petitioner James Randall Rogers filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 14 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2019. | | | Mar 25 2019 | Record Requested. | | | Mar 26 2019 | Record received from the Supreme Court of Georgia. The record is electronic. | | | Mar 28 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019. | | | Jun 26 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019. | | | Jun 28 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|