Jan 18 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 25, 2019) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceOther |
Feb 04 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed. |
| Main Document |
Feb 07 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019. |
| |
Feb 19 2019 | Response Requested. (Due March 21, 2019) |
| |
Mar 12 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 21, 2019 to April 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Mar 13 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 22, 2019. |
| |
Apr 12 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2019 to May 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Apr 12 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 6, 2019. |
| |
May 06 2019 | Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed. |
| Certificate of Word CountMain Document |
May 16 2019 | Reply of petitioner Alexis Valdes Gonzalez filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
May 22 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019. |
| |
Jun 04 2019 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Jun 10 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019. |
| |
Jun 10 2019 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Jun 17 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019. |
| |
Jun 18 2019 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Jul 05 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. |
| |
Sep 06 2019 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Dec 18 2019 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Alexis Valdes Gonzalez filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Apr 29 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020. |
| |
Apr 30 2020 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Alexis Valdes Gonzalez filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
May 12 2020 | Rescheduled. |
| |
May 18 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020. |
| |
May 19 2020 | Rescheduled. |
| |
May 22 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020. |
| |
May 26 2020 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Jun 01 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020. |
| |
Jun 08 2020 | Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, respecting the denial of certiorari: I concur for the reasons set out in St. Hubert v. United States, 590 U. S. ___ (2020) (Statement of Justice Sotomayor respecting the denial of certiorari). |
| |