SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-7569 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-7569 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Paul William Scott, Petitioner
v.
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Docketed:
January 25, 2019
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC17-2045)
Decision Date:
April 6, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
October 24, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 22 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 25, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Feb 25 2019
Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Mar 14 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2019.
Mar 25 2019
Reply of petitioner Paul Scott filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Other
Apr 01 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Rick Adam Sichta
Counsel of Record
The Sichta Firm LLC
301 W. Bay St.
Ste. 14124
Jacksonville, FL 32202
rick@sichtalaw.com
9043297246
Party name: Paul Scott
Attorneys for Respondents
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##