Dec 21 2018 | Motion (18M89) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal filed. |
| |
Dec 21 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 21, 2019) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jan 02 2019 | MOTION (18M89) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019. |
| |
Jan 22 2019 | Motion (18M89) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal Granted. |
| |
Feb 13 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 21, 2019 to March 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Feb 15 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 25, 2019. |
| |
Mar 15 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 25, 2019 to May 3, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Mar 18 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 3, 2019. |
| |
Apr 26 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 3, 2019 to June 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Apr 26 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 12, 2019. |
| |
Jun 12 2019 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED. |
| Proof of ServiceMain Document |
Jun 27 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. |
| |
Aug 26 2019 | Reply of petitioner Edgar Baltazar Garcia filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
| |