Oct 05 2018 | Application (18A393) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 23, 2018 to December 22, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions |
Oct 16 2018 | Application (18A393) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until December 22, 2018. |
| |
Dec 20 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 1, 2019) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix |
Jan 25 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 1, 2019 to March 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jan 28 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 4, 2019. |
| |
Feb 27 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2019 to April 3, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Feb 28 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 3, 2019. |
| |
Mar 15 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 3, 2019 to May 3, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Mar 18 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 3, 2019. |
| |
Apr 26 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 3, 2019 to June 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Apr 26 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 12, 2019. |
| |
Jun 12 2019 | Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed. VIDED. |
| Proof of ServiceMain Document |
Jun 26 2019 | Reply of petitioner Mark Issac Snarr filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Jun 27 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. |
| |
Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
| |