Dec 11 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 14, 2019) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service |
Jan 14 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent Texas to respond filed. |
| Main Document |
Jan 24 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019. |
| |
Feb 07 2019 | Response Requested. (Due March 11, 2019) |
| |
Mar 22 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 11, 2019 to April 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Mar 22 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 22, 2019. |
| |
Apr 23 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2019 to May 23, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Apr 26 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is further extended to and including May 22, 2019. |
| |
May 22 2019 | Brief of respondent State of Texas in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
May 29 2019 | Reply of petitioner William Owens filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Jun 05 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019. |
| |
Jun 24 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
| |