Docket for 18-6970 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 10 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 9, 2019) | | PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis | Dec 11 2018 | Application (18A606) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main Document | Dec 11 2018 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Dec 12 2018 | Reply of petitioner Jose A. Jimenez filed. | | Main Document | Dec 13 2018 | Application (18A606) referred to the Court. | | | Dec 13 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | | Dec 13 2018 | Application (18A606) denied by the Court. | | |
|