SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-697 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-697 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Tony Von Carruthers, Petitioner
v.
Tony Mays, Warden
Docketed:
November 27, 2018
Linked with 18A256
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(14-5457)
Decision Date:
May 3, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
June 26, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 11 2018
Application (18A256) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 24, 2018 to November 23, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Sep 14 2018
Application (18A256) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 23, 2018.
Nov 23 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 27, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 26 2018
Brief of respondent Tony Mays, Warden in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jan 09 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Jan 09 2019
Reply of petitioner Tony Von Carruthers filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 19 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric F. Citron
Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814
ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Tony Von Carruthers
Attorneys for Respondent
John Henry Bledsoe III
Counsel of Record
Office of Tennessee Attorney General
P. O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202
John.Bledsoe@ag.tn.gov
6157414351
Party name: Tony Mays, Warden
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##