Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-696
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-696
Title:Center for Medical Progress, et al., Petitioners
v.
Planned Parenthood Federation of America, et al.
Docketed:November 27, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-16997)
   Decision Date:May 16, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 23, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 27, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2018Waiver of right of respondents Planned Parenthood Federation of America, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 09 2019Response Requested. (Due February 8, 2019)
Jan 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2019 to February 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 31 2019Response to motion from petitioner Center for Medical Progress, et al. filed.
Main Document
Feb 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 22, 2019.
Feb 22 2019Brief of respondents Planned Parenthood Federation of America, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2019Reply of petitioners Center for Medical Progress, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2019.
Apr 01 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Charles S. LiMandri
    Counsel of Record
Freedom of Conscience Defense Fund
P.O. Box 9520
Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067

cslimandri@limandri.com
858-759-9930
Party name: Center for Medical Progress, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Steven Lee Mayer
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
3 Embarcadero Center, 10th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

steve.mayer@arnoldporter.com
415-471-3100
Party name: Planned Parenthood Federation of America, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543