Docket for 18-6956 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 24 2018 | Application (18A324) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 3, 2018 to December 2, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main Document | Oct 01 2018 | Application (18A324) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 2, 2018. | | | Dec 03 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 7, 2019) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix | Jan 03 2019 | Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | Jan 17 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019. | | | Feb 11 2019 | Reply of petitioner Jason Walton filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentOtherOther | Feb 19 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|