Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6943
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6943
Title:Gregory Dean Banister, Petitioner
v.
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:December 6, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-10826)
   Decision Date:May 8, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:June 18, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 17 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 7, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jan 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Jan 28 2019Response Requested. (Due February 27, 2019)
Feb 27 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 27, 2019 to April 26, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part, and the time is extended to and including April 10, 2019.
Mar 29 2019Letter from counsel for petitioner received.
Main Document
Apr 10 2019Brief of respondent Lorie Davis, Director TDCJ in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 24 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
Apr 24 2019Reply of petitioner Gregory Dean Banister filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 06 2019Rescheduled.
May 29 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 24 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis GRANTED, and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED limited to the following question: Whether and under what circumstances a timely Rule 59(e) motion should be recharacterized as a second or successive habeas petition under Gonzalez v. Crosby, 545 U. S. 524 (2005).
Jul 10 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 17 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 26, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 18, 2019.
Aug 26 2019Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Brief of petitioner Gregory Dean Banister filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Law Professors with Expertise in Habeas Corpus and Civil Procedure filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, December 4, 2019.
Oct 18 2019Brief of respondent Lorie Davis, Director TDCJ filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian Timothy Burgess
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
901 New York Avenue
Washington, DC 20001

BBurgess@goodwinlaw.com
2023464000
Party name: Gregory Dean Banister
Gregory Dean BanisterTDCJ #1265563
Havins-Unit
500 FM 45 East
Brownwood, TX 76801

Party name: Gregory Dean Banister
Attorneys for Respondent
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: Lorie Davis, Director TDCJ
Joseph Peter CorcoranOffice of the Attorney General of Texas
P.O. Box 12548 - Capital Station
Austin, TX 78711-2548

joseph.corcoran@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1400
Party name: Lorie Davis, Director TDCJ
Susan Frances San MiguelAssistant Attorney General
P. O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711-2548

Party name: Lorie Davis, Director TDCJ
Other
Barbara Ellen Bergman
    Counsel of Record
James E. Rogers College of Law
University of Arizona
1201 E. Speedway Blvd.
Tucson, AZ 85721-0176

bbergman@email.arizona.edu
5053017547
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Charlotte Hemenway Taylor
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

ctaylor@jonesday.com
202-879-3872
Party name: Law Professors with Expertise in Habeas Corpus and Civil Procedure

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543