SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-6906 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-6906 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
David E. Miller, Petitioner
v.
Tony Parker, Commissioner, Tennessee Department of Correction, et al.
Docketed:
December 3, 2018
Linked with 18A578
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-6222)
Decision Date:
December 3, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 03 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 2, 2019)
Petition
Appendix
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
Dec 03 2018
Application (18A578) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Dec 04 2018
Brief of respondent Tony Parker, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
Dec 05 2018
Reply of petitioner David E. Miller filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Dec 06 2018
Application (18A578) referred to the Court.
Dec 06 2018
Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor dissents. (Detached Opinion)
Dec 06 2018
Application (18A578) denied by the Court. Justice Sotomayor dissents. (Detached
Opinion
)
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen Michael Kissinger
Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Services of Eastern Tennessee
800 S. Gay Street
Suite 2400
Knoxville, TN 37929
Stephen_Kissinger@fd.org
8656377979
Party name: David Earl Miller
Attorneys for Respondents
Jennifer L. Smith
Counsel of Record
Associate Solicitor General
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202-0207
Jennifer.smith@ag.tn.gov
615-741-3487
Party name: Tony Parker, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##