Docket for 18-6872
|
Oct 10 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 31, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Dec 06 2018 | Waiver of right of respondents John E. Wetzel, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Dec 20 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019. | | | Jan 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|