Docket for 18-6821
|
Nov 20 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 26, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetition | Nov 28 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent State of Alabama to respond filed. | | Main Document | Dec 06 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019. | | | Jan 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|