Docket for 18-6820
|
Aug 10 2018 | Application (18A187) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 19, 2018 to November 18, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main Document | Aug 21 2018 | Application (18A187) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 18, 2018. | | | Nov 19 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 26, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service | Nov 30 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent Jeff Premo to respond filed. | | Main Document | Dec 06 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019. | | | Jan 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|