SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-6531
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-6531
Title:
Tyler G. Eppes, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
November 1, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
Case Numbers:
(17-0364)
Decision Date:
April 10, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
May 7, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Aug 03 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 3, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Nov 07 2018
Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 14 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Dec 03 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tyler G. Eppes
Naval Consolidated BRIG Charleston
1050 Remount Road, Bldg. 3107
Charleston, SC 29466
Party name: Tyler G. Eppes
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##