Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-648
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-648
Title:Burdette Searcey, et al., Petitioners
v.
James L. Dean, et al.
Docketed:November 19, 2018
Linked with 18A379
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4059)
   Decision Date:June 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:July 17, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2018Application (18A379) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 15, 2018 to November 15, 2018, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 10 2018Application (18A379) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until November 14, 2018.
Nov 14 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 19, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018Waiver of James Dean, et al. of right to respond not accepted for filing. (December 20, 2018)
Dec 20 2018Waiver of right of respondent Debra Shelden to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 20 2018Waiver of right of respondents Lois White, Personal Represenative for the Estate of Joseph White, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 21 2018Waiver of right of respondent James Dean to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 09 2019Response Requested. (Due February 8, 2019)
Jan 30 2019Brief of respondents James L. Dean, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Feb 14 2019Reply of County of Gage, et al. not accepted for filing. (February 14, 2019) (Corrected version submitted)
Feb 14 2019Reply of petitioners County of Gage, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios
    Counsel of Record
Wolfe, Snowden, Hurd, Luers & Ahl, LLP
1248 O Street Suite 800
Lincoln, NE 68508

mmantzios@wolfesnowden.com
4024741507
Party name: County of Gage, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert Franklin Bartle
    Counsel of Record
Bartle & Geier Law Firm
1141 H Street
Lincoln, NE 68508

tpetsche@bartlegeierlaw.com
4024762847
Party name: Lois White, Personal Represenative for the Estate of Joseph White, Thomas Winslow, Ada JoAnn Taylor, and Kathleen Gonzalez
Maren Lynn ChaloupkaChaloupka, Holyoke, Snyder, Chaloupka & Longoria, PC, LLO
P.O. Box 2424
1714 2nd Avenue
Scottsbluff, NE 69363-2424

mlc@chhsclaw.net
(308) 635-5000
Party name: Debra Shelden

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543