Docket for 18-6378 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Oct 15 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 19, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix | Nov 06 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 19, 2018 to December 19, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 09 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 19, 2018. | | | Dec 19 2018 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 03 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019. | | | Jan 22 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|