SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-6298 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-6298 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Robert Alan Fratta, Petitioner
v.
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:
October 11, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(17-70023)
Decision Date:
May 1, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
June 5, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Aug 29 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 13, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Nov 13 2018
Brief of respondent Lorie Davis in opposition filed.
Proof of Service
Main Document
Nov 29 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 19 2018
Reply of petitioner Robert Fratta filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Jan 07 2019
Petition DENIED.
Jan 31 2019
Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 06 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019
Rehearing DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Alan Fratta
#999189
3872 FM 350 South
Livingston, TX 77351
(936) 967-8082
Party name: Robert Fratta
Attorneys for Respondent
Ellen Stewart-Klein
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Texas
P.O. Box 12548
Capitol Station
Austin, TX 78711-2548
ellen.stewart-klein@oag.texas.gov
5125370147
Party name: Lorie Davis
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##