Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-609
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-609
Title:Joseph David Robertson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 9, 2018
Linked with 18A108
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-30178)
   Decision Date:November 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:July 10, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 26 2018Application (18A108) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 8, 2018 to December 7, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
OtherMain DocumentOtherOther
Jul 30 2018Application (18A108) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until November 7, 2018.
Nov 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Joseph David Robertson.
Blanket Consent
Dec 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 10, 2018 to January 9, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 06 2018Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2018Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 9, 2019.
Dec 10 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2018Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2018Brief amici curiae of Duarte Nursery, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Home Builders filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 9, 2019 to February 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 8, 2019.
Jan 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2019 to March 11, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 11, 2019.
Mar 11 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 22 2019Reply of petitioner Joseph David Robertson filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Mar 27 2019Motion to substitute Carri Robertson, as authorized representative, as petitioner in place of Joseph David Robertson, Deceased under Rule 35.1 filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 07 2019Letter of April 7, 2019 from counsel for petitioner filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 15 2019The motion to substitute Carri Robertson, authorized representative, as petitioner in place of Joseph D. Robertson, Deceased is granted.
Apr 15 2019Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for consideration of the question whether the case is moot.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anthony Lee Francois
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

alf@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Joseph David Robertson
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Paul J. Beard II
    Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird LLP
1121 L Street, Suite 700
Sacramento, CA 95834

paul.beard@alston.com
9164983354
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Chris Fedeli
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
Judicial Watch, Inc., 425 Third Street, SW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20024

cfedeli@judicialwatch.org
202-646-5185
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation
Peter Stanley Prows
    Counsel of Record
Briscoe Ivester & Bazel LLP
155 Sansome Street, Suite 700
San Francisco, CA 94104

pprows@briscoelaw.net
415-402-2708
Party name: Duarte Nursery, Inc., et al.
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute
Thomas Jon Ward
    Counsel of Record
National Association of Home Builders
1201 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

tward@nahb.org
202 266-8230
Party name: National Association of Home Builders
Anthony Thomas CasoCenter for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543