Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-5924
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-5924
Title:Evangelisto Ramos, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:September 11, 2018
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of Louisiana, Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-KA-1199)
   Decision Date:November 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 15, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 11, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionPetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 20 2018Waiver of right of respondent Louisiana to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 09 2018Response Requested. (Due November 8, 2018)
Nov 08 2018Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 27 2018Reply of petitioner Evangelisto Ramos filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Mar 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 18 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
G. Ben Cohen
    Counsel of Record
The Promise of Justice Initiative
636 Baronne Street
New Orleans, LA 70115

benc@thejusticecenter.org
504-529-5955
Party name: Evangelisto Ramos
Attorneys for Respondent
Christopher James PonoroffOrleans Parish District Attorney's Office
619 S. White St.
New Orleans, LA 70119

cponoroff@orleansda.com
504-822-2414
Party name: Louisiana

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543