Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-588
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-588
Vide 18-587, 18-589
Title:Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al., Petitioners
v.
National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, et al.
Docketed:November 5, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-5243)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due December 5, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceOther
Nov 27 2018Letter of November 27, 2018 from the Solicitor General with respect to corrected supplemental brief of petitioners filed in case No. 18-587 filed. (11/28/2018)
Main Document
Nov 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 5, 2018 to January 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part; the time is extended to and including December 17, 2018, for all respondents.
Dec 06 2018Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Brief of respondents Trustees of Princeton University, Microsoft Corporation, Maria De La Cruz Perales Sanchez in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Dec 26 2018Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jan 04 2019Reply of petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jun 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 18-587 and the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment in No. 18-589 are granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jul 01 2019Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 18-587. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 18-587. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the fling is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jul 08 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, November 12, 2019. VIDED
Sep 03 2019CIRCULATED
Sep 16 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. District of Columbia Circuit.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Lindsay C. Harrison
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

LHarrison@jenner.com
(202)-639-6000
Party name: Princeton University, Microsoft Corporation, Maria De La Cruz Perales Sanchez
Other
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: THE STATES OF TEXAS, ALABAMA, ARIZONA, ARKANSAS, FLORIDA, LOUISIANA, NEBRASKA, SOUTH CAROLINA, AND WEST VIRGINIA, AND GOVERNOR PHIL BRYANT OF THE STATE OF MISSISSIPPI

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543