Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-587
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-587
Vide 18-588, 18-589
Title:Department of Homeland Security, et al., Petitioners
v.
Regents of the University of California, et al.
Docketed:November 5, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-15068, 18-15069, 18-15070, 18-15071, 18-15072, 18-15128, 18-15133, 18-15134)
   Decision Date:November 8, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due December 5, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceOther
Nov 19 2018Supplemental brief of petitioners Department of Homeland Security, et al. filed. (Corrected version submitted)
Nov 19 2018Supplemental brief of petitioners Department of Homeland Security, et al. filed. (11/28/2018)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 27 2018Letter of November 27, 2018 from the Solicitor General with respect to corrected supplemental brief of petitioners filed. (11/28/2018)
Main Document
Nov 29 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 5, 2018 to December 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 17, 2018, for all respondents.
Dec 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2018Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2018Brief amici curiae of Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, English First Foundation, Public Advocate of the U.S., The Senior Citizens League, 60 Plus Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Gun Owners Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Patriotic Vete filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Brief of respondents States of California, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Brief of respondents Regents of the Univeristy of California, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Brief of respondents Dulce Garcia, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Dec 26 2018Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jan 04 2019Reply of petitioners Department of Homeland Security, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jun 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. The petitions for writs of certiorari before judgment in No. 18-588 and No. 18-589 are granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jul 01 2019Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 18-587. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 18-587. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the fling is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jul 08 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, November 12, 2019. VIDED
Jul 10 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Department of Homeland Security, et al. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Jul 17 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Dulce Garcia, Miriam Gonzalez Avila, Saul Jimenez Suarez, Viridiana Chabolla Mendoza, Norma Ramirez, and Jirayut Latthivongskorn. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Jul 22 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Jul 23 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, County of Santa Clara and Service Employees International Union Local 521.
Blanket Consent
Jul 29 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Princeton University, Microsoft Corporation, Maria De La Cruz Perales Sanchez
Blanket Consent
Jul 30 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 19, 2019. The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including September 27, 2019. The reply brief is to be filed in accordance with Rule 25.3.
Jul 30 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Regents of the Univeristy of California and Janet Napolitano, President of the University of California. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Jul 30 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, New York, et al. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Jul 31 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Martin Jonathan Batalla Vidal, et al. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Aug 01 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, States of California, et al. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Aug 19 2019Joint appendix filed (2 volumes). VIDED.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Aug 19 2019Brief of petitioners Department of Homeland Security, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Brief amici curiae of Professors--Dean Ronald A. Cass, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Amici brief of States of Texas, et al. not accepted for filing. (August 26, 2019 - Corrected brief to be submitted)
Aug 26 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Brief amici curiae of Save Jobs USA, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Brief amici curiae of Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, and The Presidential Coalition, LLC filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2019Amicus brief of Cato Institute not accepted for filing. (August 30, 2019) (Duplicate submission).
Aug 26 2019Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2019CIRCULATED
Sep 16 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Sep 17 2019Record received from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Sep 17 2019Record received from the U.S.D.C. District of Califorina, San Francisco Division is electronic and located on PACER with the exception of Sealed documents which is electronically filed.
Sep 20 2019Motion of States of Texas, et al. for enlargement of time for oral argument, for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 23 2019Response of petitioners to motion of Texas, et al. for enlargement of time for oral argument, for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument, filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 26 2019Brief amici curiae of DACA Recipients and State of New Jersey filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2019Joint motion of respondents for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument, and response to motion of Texas, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Brief of respondents States of California, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Brief of respondents Regents of the University of California, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Brief of D.C. Respondents filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Brief of respondents New York, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2019Brief of respondents DACA Recipient Respondents, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2019Brief amici curiae of National Queer Asian Pacific Islander Alliance, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Tim Cook, Deirdre O'Brien and Apple,et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2019Brief amici curiae of United We Dream and 50 Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Nineteen Colleges And Universities filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Brief amici curiae of 143 U.S. Business Associations and Companies filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of Government of the United Mexican States filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Prosecutors and Law Enforcement Leaders filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Current Members of Congress and Bipartisan Former Members of Congress filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Administrative Law Scholars filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Amicus brief of American Council on Education and 43 Other Higher Education Associations not accepted for filing. (October 21, 2019 - Corrected version submitted)
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of American Council on Education and 43 Other Higher Education Associations filed. VIDED.(Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of 109 Cities, Counties, Municipalities, and Local Government Advocacy Organizations filed. VIDED (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of National School Boards Association, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed). (Corrected brief filed).
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed). (October 15, 2019).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of American Historical Association, et al. filed. VIDED (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Former National Security Officials filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Former Homeland Security and Immigration Officials filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2019Amicus brief of American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children, et al. not accepted for filing. (October 08, 2019 - to be corrected)
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed). (October 9, 2019).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Institutions of Higher Education filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Nevada, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Home Builders, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of Teach for America, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Public Citizen, Inc, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Service Employees International Union, American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations, and American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Public Interest Law Center, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of National Education Association and National PTA filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Empirical Scholars filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Immigration Law Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Administrative Law Practitioners filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Former Service Secretaries, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Association of American Medical Colleges, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Amicus brief of Nonprofit Legal Services Organizations not accepted for filing. (October 23, 2019)
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Nonprofit Legal Services Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Alianza Americas, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2019Brief amici curiae of 127 Religious Organizations filed. VIDED. (Distributed)(10/22/2019)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2019Joint motion of respondents for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument is GRANTED in part and the time is divided as follows: 30 minutes for the Solicitor General, 15 minutes for the private respondents, and 15 minutes for the state respondents. VIDED.
Oct 15 2019Motion of Texas, et al. for enlargement of time for oral argument, for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae, and for divided argument DENIED. VIDED.
Oct 28 2019Reply of petitioners Department of Homeland Security, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Nov 01 2019A total of 80 minutes is allotted for oral argument, and the time is divided as follows: 40 minutes for the Solicitor General, 20 minutes for the private respondents, and 20 minutes for the state respondents. VIDED.
Nov 12 2019Argued. For petitioners: Noel J. Francisco, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For private respondents: Theodore B. Olson, Washington, D. C. For state respondents: Michael J. Mongan, Solicitor General, San Francisco, Cal. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Lindsay C. Harrison
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

LHarrison@jenner.com
(202)-639-6000
Party name: Princeton University, Microsoft Corporation, Maria De La Cruz Perales Sanchez
Stacey Monica Leyton
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon, LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

sleyton@altshulerberzon.com
4154217151
Party name: County of Santa Clara and Service Employees International Union Local 521
Robert A. Long Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Avenue,NW
Washington, DC 20001

rlong@cov.com
202-662-6000
Party name: Regents of the Univeristy of California and Janet Napolitano, President of the University of California
Michael James Mongan
    Counsel of Record
State of CA, Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

michael.mongan@doj.ca.gov
(415) 510-3920
Party name: States of California, et al.
Theodore B. Olson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

tolson@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: Dulce Garcia, et al.
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: New York, et al.
Michael J. Wishnie
    Counsel of Record
Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization at Yale Law School
P.O. Box 209090
New Haven, CT 06520-9090

michael.wishnie@yale.edu
203-432-4780
Party name: Martin Jonathan Batalla Vidal, et al.
Other
Maureen Patricia Alger
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3175 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304

malger@cooley.com
6508435201
Party name: Nonprofit Legal Services Organizations
Ronald G. Blum
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

rblum@manatt.com
212-830-7186
Party name: Teach for America, Inc.
Nikolas Bowie
    Counsel of Record
Lawyers for Civil Rights
61 Batterymarch Street
5th Floor
Boston, MA 02110

nbowie@law.harvard.edu
6179880606
Party name: Empirical Scholars
Richard P. Bress
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

rick.bress@lw.com
202-637-2137
Party name: National School Boards Association, School Superintendents Association, National Association of Secondary School Principals, and American School Counselor Association
Ronald Andrew Cass
    Counsel of Record
Cass & Associates, PC
10560 Fox Forest Drive
Great Falls, VA 22066

roncass@cassassociates.net
7034387590
Party name: Professors--Dean Ronald A. Cass, Christopher C. Demuth, Sr., James L. Huffman
William D. Coston
    Counsel of Record
Venable LLP
600 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

WDCoston@venable.com
2023444168
Party name: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al.
Michael Joseph Dundas
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney
200 N. Main Street, 7th Floor CHE
Los Angeles, CA 90012

mike.dundas@lacity.org
213-978-8130
Party name: 109 Cities, Counties, Municipalities, and Local Government Advocacy Organizations
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Susan Marie Finegan
    Counsel of Record
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C.
One Financial Center
Boston, MA 02111

SMFinegan@mintz.com
617-542-6000
Party name: National Queer Asian Pacific Islander Alliance
Jonathan Saul Franklin
    Counsel of Record
Norton Rose Fulbright US, LLP
799 9th Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20001

jonathan.franklin@nortonrosefulbright.com
2026624663
Party name: Association of American Medical Colleges, et al.
Albert Quoc Giang
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
725 South Figueroa Street
Los Angeles, CA 90017

agiang@bsfllp.com
2136299040
Party name: Former Homeland Security and Immigration Officials
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Current Members of Congress and Bipartisan Former Members of Congress
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Service Employees International Union, American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations, and American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
(512) 936-1700
Party name: States of Texas, et al.
Thomas Warnes Hazlett
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr
1735 Market Street
51st Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

hazlettt@ballardspahr.com
215-665-8500
Party name: Public Interest Law Center, et al.
Kurt Robert Hilbert
    Counsel of Record
The Hilbert Law Firm, LLC
205 Norcross Street
Roswell, GA 30075

khilbert@hilbertlaw.com
7705519310
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Peter Karanjia
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP (US)
500 Eighth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

peter.karanjia@dlapiper.com
202-799-4000
Party name: United We Dream and 50 Organizations
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: American Council on Education and 43 Other Higher Education Associations
Charles Bennett Klein
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
1700 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

cklein@winston.com
202-282-5977
Party name: Former Service Secretaries, et al.
Harold Hongju Koh
    Counsel of Record
Peter Gruber Rule of Law Clinic
Yale Law School
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06520

harold.koh@ylsclinics.org
203-432-4932
Party name: Former National Security Officials
Harry Lee
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson
1330 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036-0000

hlee@steptoe.com
2024298112
Party name: Immigration Law Scholars
Adela Elvia Ruth McChesney
    Counsel of Record
De Mott, McChesney, Curtright & Armendariz, L.L.P.
8023 Vantage Drive, Suite 800
San Antonio, TX 78230

ruth@dmcausa.com
2105901844
Party name: Government of the United Mexican States
Mary B. McCord
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Constitutional Advocacy and Protection
600 New Jersey Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

mbm7@georgetown.edu
202-661-6607
Party name: Current and Former Prosecutors and Law Enforcement Leaders
Neil V. McKittrick
    Counsel of Record
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
One Boston Place, Suite 3500
Boston, MA 02108

neil.mckittrick@ogletree.com
617-994-5726
Party name: Alianza Americas, et al.
Natasha Clarise Merle
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.
40 Rector Street
5th Floor
New York, NY 10006

nmerle@naacpldf.org
2129652200
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
212-326-2000
Party name: Nineteen Colleges And Universities
John Michael Miano
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Suite 315
Washington, DC 20001

miano@colosseumbuilders.com
202-232-5590
Party name: Save Jobs USA
Stephen William Miller
    Counsel of Record
Harris, Wiltshire & Grannis LLP
1919 M Street NW, Eighth Floor
Washington, DC 20036

smiller@hwglaw.com
2027301305
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops et al.
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., American Civil Liberties Union
Alice Margaret O'Brien
    Counsel of Record
National Education Association
1201 16th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

aobrien@nea.org
202 822 7048
Party name: National Education Association and National PTA
Robert Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

rob@wjopc.com
703-356-5070
Party name: Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, and The Presidential Coalition, LLC
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, English First Foundation, Public Advocate of the U.S., The Senior Citizens League, 60 Plus Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Gun Owners Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Patriotic Veterans, Policy Analysis Center, and Restoring Liberty Action Committee
Nina Perales
    Counsel of Record
MALDEF
110 Broadway
Suite 300
San Antonio, TX 78205

nperales@maldef.org
2102245476
Party name: DACA Recipients and State of New Jersey
Mary Kelly Persyn
    Counsel of Record
Persyn Law & Policy
912 Cole Street, PMB 124
San Francisco, CA 94117

marykelly@persynlaw.com
16284001254
Party name: American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children, American Academy of Pediatrics, Center for Law and Social Policy, and 33 Child Advocacy Organizations, Medical Professionals, and Child Development Experts
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: 143 U.S. Business Associations and Companies
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5000
Party name: Tim Cook, Deirdre O'Brien and Apple
Kevin K. Russell
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein and Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

krussell@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Administrative Law Practitioners
Andrew L. Schlafly
    Counsel of Record
939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
908-719-8608
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: American Historical Association, Organization of American Historians, 42 Historians, and The Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute
Bruce V. Spiva
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
700 13th St NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

bspiva@perkinscoie.com
202-654-6203
Party name: Institutions of Higher Education
Heidi Jill Parry Stern
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Nevada Attorney General
100 North Carson Street
Carson City, NV 89701

hstern@ag.nv.gov
775-684-1100
Party name: States of Nevada, et al.
Gavin Robert Villareal
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
98 San Jacinto Boulevard
Austin, TX 78701

gavin.villareal@bakerbotts.com
512-322-2652
Party name: The National Association of Home Builders, The Real Estate Roundtable, and The Essential Worker Immigration Coalition
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Administrative Law Scholars
Steven Alan Zalesin
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb and Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

sazalesin@pbwt.com
2123362000
Party name: 127 Religious Organizations

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543