Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-5856
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-5856
Title:David Gerard Jeep, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 4, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3681)
   Decision Date:May 30, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 22 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 4, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix
Oct 04 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. See Rule 39.8. As the petitioner has repeatedly abused this Court's process, the Clerk is directed not to accept any further petitions in noncriminal matters from petitioner unless the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) is paid and the petition is submitted in compliance with Rule 33.1. See Martin v. District of Columbia Court of Appeals, 506 U. S. 1 (1992) (per curiam).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Gerard JeepGeneral Delivery
Saint Louis, MO 63155-9999

Dave@DGJeep.com
(314) 514-5228
Party name: David Jeep
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543