Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-556
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-556
Title:Kansas, Petitioner
v.
Charles Glover
Docketed:October 29, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Kansas
   Case Numbers:(116,446)
   Decision Date:July 27, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 25 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 28, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Waiver of right of respondent Charles Glover to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 28 2018Brief amici curiae of States of Oklahoma, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 19 2018Response Requested. (Due January 18, 2019)
Jan 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 18, 2019 to February 19, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 19, 2019.
Feb 19 2019Brief of respondent Charles Glover in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2019Reply of petitioner Kansas filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2019.
Mar 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2019.
Apr 01 2019Petition GRANTED.
Apr 04 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Apr 09 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Kansas.
Main Document
Apr 15 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 17, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 16, 2019.
Apr 16 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Kansas
Blanket Consent
May 28 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Jun 17 2019Brief of petitioner Kansas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of National District Attorneys Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 24 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Oklahoma, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Fraternal Order of Police filed.
Main Document
Jun 24 2019Affidavit of Service filed with respect to brief of amicus curiae of The National Fraternal Order of Police.
Main Document
Jun 24 2019Certificate of Compliance filed with respect to brief of amicus curiae of The National Fraternal Order of Police.
Main Document
Jul 08 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, November 4, 2019.
Jul 12 2019Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Jul 12 2019Motion for a further extension of time to file respondent's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including August 30, 2019.
Jul 19 2019Motion of United States for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Toby Crouse
    Counsel of Record
Office of Attorney General Derek Schmidt
120 S.W. 10th Avenue
2nd Floor
Topeka, KS 66612

toby.crouse@ag.ks.gov
785.368.6693
Party name: Kansas
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah Elaine Harrington
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

sharrington@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Charles Glover
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Larry H. James
    Counsel of Record
Crabbe Brown & James, LLP
500 South Front Street
Suite 1200
Columbus, OH 43215

ljames@cbjlawyers.com
614-228-5511
Party name: National Fraternal Order of Police
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts LLP
1299 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

scott.keller@bakerbotts.com
2026397837
Party name: National District Attorneys Association
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: States of Oklahoma, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543