SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-5399 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-5399 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Joseph Andrew Perez, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:
July 30, 2018
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of California
Case Numbers:
(S104144)
Decision Date:
March 1, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
May 16, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 18 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 29, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Aug 15 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 29, 2018 to September 28, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 17 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 28, 2018.
Sep 26 2018
Brief of respondent The State of California in opposition filed.
Main Document
Main Document
Oct 04 2018
Reply of petitioner Joseph Andrew Perez filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Oct 11 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allen Richard Ellis
Counsel of Record
75 Magee Avenue
Mill Valley, CA 94941-4532
a.r.ellis@att.net
4153896771
Party name: Joseph Andrew Perez
Attorneys for Respondent
Glenn Richard Pruden
Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice, Attorney General's Office
455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102
glenn.pruden@doj.ca.gov
(415) 510-3845
Party name: The State of California
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##