Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-5384
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-5384
Title:Wendell Rivera-Ruperto, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 30, 2018
Linked with 17A1208
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(12-2364, 12-2367, 13-2017)
   Decision Date:January 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:February 27, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 02 2018Application (17A1208) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 28, 2018 to July 27, 2018, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
May 03 2018Application (17A1208) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until July 27, 2018.
Jul 27 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 29, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Aug 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 28, 2018.
Aug 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 29, 2018 to September 28, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 28, 2018 to October 29, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 29, 2018.
Oct 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 28, 2018.
Oct 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 29, 2018 to November 28, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 22, 2019.
Nov 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 28, 2018 to January 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 22 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 06 2019Reply of petitioner Wendell Rivera-Ruperto filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Hermes Manuel Hernandez
    Counsel of Record
H. Manuel Hernandez, P.A.
620 East Club Circle
Longwood, FL 32779

manny@hmh4law.com
407-682-5553
Party name: Wendell Rivera-Ruperto
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543