Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-532
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-532
Title:Sixty-01 Association of Apartment Owners, Petitioner
v.
Penny D. Goudelock
Docketed:October 23, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-35384)
   Decision Date:July 10, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 23, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2018Waiver of Penny D. Goudelock of right to respond not accepted for filing. (October 24, 2018 - to be corrected)
Oct 23 2018Waiver of right of respondent Penny D. Goudelock to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.
Nov 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of Community Associations Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 19 2018Petition DENIED.
Dec 10 2018Record requested from the District Court of Wyoming, Sheridan County.
Dec 27 2018Record received from the District Court of Wyoming, Sheridan County, Two boxes..
Jun 21 2019MANDATE ISSUED.
Jun 21 2019JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen M. Smith
    Counsel of Record
Sound Legal Partners, PLLC
6161 NE 175th St., Ste 205
Kenmore, WA 98028

stephen@soundlegalpartners.com
206-823-1040
Party name: Sixty-01 Association of Apartment Owners
Attorneys for Respondent
Nathaniel Peardon Garrett
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
555 California Street, 26th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

ngarrett@jonesday.com
4158755731
Party name: Penny D. Goudelock
Other
Thomas Owen Moriarty
    Counsel of Record
Moriarty Troyer & Malloy LLC
30 Braintree Hill Office Park
Suite #205
Braintree, MA 02184

tmoriarty@lawmtm.com
7818174900
Party name: Community Associations Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543