Docket for 18-5065 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Apr 18 2018 | Application (17A1158) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 1, 2018 to June 30, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 23 2018 | Application (17A1158) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 30, 2018. | | | Jul 02 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 6, 2018) | | PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServiceAppendix | Aug 02 2018 | Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Aug 16 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. | | | Aug 27 2018 | Reply of petitioner Manuel Antonio Rodriguez filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 01 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|