Docket for 18-5060 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Apr 02 2018 | Application (17A1067) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 29, 2018 to June 28, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 05 2018 | Application (17A1067) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 28, 2018. | | | Jun 27 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 30, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jul 27 2018 | Brief of respondent State if Florida in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Aug 09 2018 | Reply of petitioner Konstantino Fotopoulos filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Aug 16 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. | | | Oct 01 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|