SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-463
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-463
Title:
Bernard Morello, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:
October 12, 2018
Linked with 18A266
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Texas
Case Numbers:
(16-0457)
Decision Date:
February 23, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
June 22, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 10 2018
Application (18A266) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 20, 2018 to October 10, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Other
Sep 13 2018
Application (18A266) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 10, 2018.
Oct 10 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Other
Oct 16 2018
Waiver of right of respondent Texas to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 31 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.
Nov 19 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William L Bowers Jr.
Counsel of Record
Lucci Smith Law Firm
2550 Gray Falls Drive
Houston, TX 77077
admin@LucciSmithLaw.com
832-494-1700
Party name: Bernard J. Morello
Attorneys for Respondent
Craig J. Pritzlaff
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Texas
P.O. Box 12548, MC 066
Austin, TX 78711-2548
craig.pritzlaff@oag.texas.gov
512-475-4138
Party name: Texas
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##