SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-454
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-454
Title:
Derek L. Dinger, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
October 11, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
Case Numbers:
(17-0510/MC)
Decision Date:
June 18, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
August 2, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Oct 05 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2018)
Petition
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Other
Oct 17 2018
Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 24 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Oct 29 2018
Brief amici curiae of National Institute of Military Justice, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Nov 13 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eugene R. Fidell
Counsel of Record
Feldesman Tucker Leifer Fidell LLP
1129 20th Street, N.W., Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036
efidell@ftlf.com
(202) 256-8675
Party name: Derek L. Dinger
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Michael Meredith Epstein
Counsel of Record
Amicus Project at Southwestern Law School
3050 Wilshire Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 90403
amicusproject@swlaw.edu
213-738-6774
Party name: National Institute of Military Justice, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##