SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-343
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-343
Title:
Raiden J. Andrews, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
September 18, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
Case Numbers:
(17-0480)
Decision Date:
May 22, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
June 27, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 13 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 18, 2018)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 24 2018
Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 03 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jacob Edward Meusch
Counsel of Record
United States Navy Judge Advocate General Corps
1254 Charles Morris Sreet, SE Suite 320
Washington Navy Yard, DC 20374-5124
jacob.meusch@navy.mil
(202) 685-7290
Party name: Raiden J. Andrews
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##