Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-328
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-328
Title:Kevin C. Rotkiske, Petitioner
v.
Paul Klemm, et al.
Docketed:September 13, 2018
Linked with 18A161
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1668)
   Decision Date:May 15, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 09 2018Application (18A161) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 13, 2018 to October 12, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Aug 15 2018Application (18A161) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 12, 2018.
Sep 11 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 15, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.
Nov 05 2018Response Requested. (Due December 5, 2018)
Nov 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 5, 2018 to January 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 4, 2019.
Jan 04 2019Brief of respondents Paul Klemm, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition GRANTED.
Mar 08 2019Joint motion of the parties for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Mar 19 2019Joint motion of the parties to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 13, 2019. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 12, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott E. Gant
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
1401 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

sgant@bsfllp.com
202-237-2727
Party name: Petitioner
Scott E. GantBoies Schiller Flexner LLP
1401 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

sgant@bsfllp.com
202-237-2727
Party name: Kevin Rotkiske
Matthew Benjamin WeisbergWeisberg Law
7 S. Morton Ave.
Morton, PA 19070

mweisberg@weisberglawoffices.com
6106900801
Party name: Kevin Rotkiske
Attorneys for Respondents
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
2028793474
Party name: Paul Klemm, et al.
Carl Edward ZapffeFenton & McGarvey Law Firm, P.S.C.
2401 Stanley Gault Parkway
Louisville, KY 40223

carlzapffe@gmail.com
502-560-6700
Party name: Paul Klemm, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543