Docket for 18-321
|
Aug 01 2018 | Application (18A117) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 12, 2018 to September 12, 2018, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Aug 02 2018 | Application (18A117) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until September 12, 2018. | | | Sep 12 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 12, 2018) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 05 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 12, 2018 to November 11, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 09 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 13, 2018. | | | Oct 12 2018 | Brief amici curiae of Media Critics, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 24 2018 | Brief of respondent Fox News Network, LLC in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 07 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018. | | | Nov 07 2018 | Reply of petitioner TVEyes, Inc. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 03 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|