Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-311
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-311
Title:Exxon Mobil Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Maura Healey, Attorney General of Massachussetts
Docketed:September 11, 2018
Linked with 17A1326
Lower Ct:Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
   Case Numbers:(SJC-12376)
   Decision Date:April 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 29 2018Application (17A1326) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 12, 2018 to September 10, 2018, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main Document
May 31 2018Application (17A1326) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until September 10, 2018.
Sep 10 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Exxon Mobil Corporation.
Blanket Consent
Oct 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2018Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Oct 29 2018Response Requested. (Due November 28, 2018)
Nov 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 28, 2018 to January 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 25, 2019.
Dec 04 2018Brief of respondent Maura Healey, Attorney General of Massachusetts in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 19 2018Reply of petitioner Exxon Mobil Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

kshanmugam@wc.com
(202) 434-5000
Party name: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
Seth Gardner Schofield
    Counsel of Record
Massachusetts Attorney General's Office
Energy and Environment Bureau
One Ashburton Place, 18th Floor
Boston, MA 02108-1598

seth.schofield@state.ma.us
(617) 963-2436
Party name: Maura Healey, Attorney General of Massachusetts
Maura T. HealeyMassachusetts Office of the Attorney General
1 Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

maura.healey@state.ma.us
(617)-963-2068
Party name: Maura Healey
Other
Matthew T. Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Warner Norcross and Judd LLP
111 Lyon Street, NW
900 Fifth Third Center
Grand Rapids, MI 49503

mnelson@wnj.com
(616) 752-2000
Party name: DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and National Association of Manufacturers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543