Docket for 18-309
|
Sep 07 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 18 2018 | Brief of respondent Araceli Rodriguez in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 03 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018. | | | Oct 29 2018 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. | | | Apr 11 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. | | Main DocumentMain Document | Apr 30 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019. | | | May 20 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019. | | | Feb 26 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020. | | | Mar 02 2020 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Hernandez v. Mesa, 589 U. S. ___ (2020). | | | Apr 03 2020 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|