Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-280
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-280
Title:New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
City of New York, New York, et al.
Docketed:September 6, 2018
Linked with 17A1393
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-638)
   Decision Date:February 23, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 5, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 20 2018Application (17A1393) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 4, 2018 to August 3, 2018, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 21 2018Application (17A1393) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until August 3, 2018.
Jul 19 2018Application (17A1393) to extend further the time from August 3, 2018 to September 2, 2018, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jul 23 2018Application (17A1393) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until September 4, 2018.
Sep 04 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 9, 2018 to November 8, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 8, 2018.
Sep 28 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al..
Blanket Consent
Oct 09 2018Brief amici curiae of Western States Sheriffs' Association et al filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Brief amici curiae of The States of Louisiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Brief amici curiae of Gun Owners of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2018Brief of City of New York, et al. in opposition not accepted for filing. (November 09, 2018) (Corrected version submitted November 9, 2018).
Nov 08 2018Brief of respondents City of New York, et al. in opposition filed.(11/14/2018)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Nov 28 2018Reply of petitioners New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 22 2019Petition GRANTED.
Feb 12 2019Joint motion for an extension of time for filing the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Feb 21 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al..
Blanket Consent
Feb 25 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including May 7, 2019. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 5, 2019.
Mar 11 2019Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Richard Paul Dearing
    Counsel of Record
New York City Law Department
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

rdearing@law.nyc.gov
2123562500
Party name: City of New York, et al.
Other
Chris Fedeli
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
Judicial Watch, Inc., 425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024

cfedeli@judicialwatch.org
202-646-5172
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Louisiana Dept. of Justice
1885 North Third Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: The States of Louisiana, et al.
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
703-356-5070
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Gun Owners Foundation, The Heller Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Downsize DC Foundation, DownsizeDC.org, and Restoring Liberty Action Committee
Dan Mark Peterson
    Counsel of Record
Dan M. Peterson, PLLC
3925 Chain Bridge Road
Suite 403
Fairfax, VA 22030

dan@danpetersonlaw.com
703-352-7276
Party name: Western States Sheriffs' Association et al

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543