Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-260
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-260
Title:County of Maui, Hawaii, Petitioner
v.
Hawaii Wildlife Fund, et al.
Docketed:August 30, 2018
Linked with 17A1343
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-17447)
   Decision Date:March 30, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 31 2018Application (17A1343) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 28, 2018 to August 27, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 04 2018Application (17A1343) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until August 27, 2018.
Aug 27 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 1, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2018 to October 31, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 31, 2018.
Oct 01 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018Brief amici curiae of Association of California Water Agencies, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018Brief amici curiae of State of West Virginia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 05 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner County of Maui, Hawaii filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 23 2018Brief of respondents Hawai'i Wildlife Fund, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2018Reply of petitioner County of Maui, Hawaii filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Nov 20 2018Supplemental brief of respondents Hawai'i Wildlife Fund, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 03 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States on or before 4 p.m., Friday, January 4, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael R. Shebelskie
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219

mshebelskie@huntonak.com
804-788-8200
Party name: County of Maui, Hawaii
Attorneys for Respondents
David Lane Henkin
    Counsel of Record
Earthjustice
850 Richards Street, Suite 400
Honolulu, HI 96813

dhenkin@earthjustice.org
8085992436
Party name: Hawai'i Wildlife Fund, et al.
Other
Jonathan Gerard Andre Monette
    Counsel of Record
Best Best & Krieger, LP
2000 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W., Suite 5300
Washington, DC 20006

andre.monette@bbklaw.com
(202) 785-0600
Party name: Association of California Water Agencies, California Association of Sanitation Agencies, International Municipal Lawyers Association, Idaho Water Users Associations, Idaho Water Resources Board, League of California Cities, National Association of Clean Water Agencies, National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, National Water Resources Association, Watereuse Association and Western Coalition of Arid States
Damien Michael Schiff
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

dschiff@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
1900 Kanawha Blvd E, Bldg 1 Rm 26E
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
304-558-2021
Party name: State of West Virginia, 17 other States, and the Governors of Kentucky and Mississippi

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543