Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-217
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-217
Title:Randall Mathena, Warden, Petitioner
v.
Lee Boyd Malvo
Docketed:August 20, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-6746, 17-6758)
   Decision Date:June 21, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 19, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 19, 2018 to October 19, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 31 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 19, 2018
Sep 18 2018Brief amicus curiae of Maryland Crime Victims' Resource Center, Inc. filed.
OtherCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 19 2018Brief of respondent Lee Boyd Malvo in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2018Reply of petitioner Randall Mathena filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Nov 29 2018Rescheduled.
Dec 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.
Dec 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Mar 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 18 2019Petition GRANTED.
Mar 19 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Randall Mathena.
Blanket Consent
Mar 20 2019Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Apr 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 11, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 20, 2019.
Jun 11 2019Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 11 2019Brief of petitioner Randall Mathena filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Indiana, Alabama, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Idaho, Louisiana, Montana, Nebraska, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, and Wyoming filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Brief amici curiae of Jonathan F. Mitchell and Adam K. Mortara filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Maryland Crime Victims' Resource Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, October 16, 2019.
Jul 17 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Toby Jay Heytens
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

SolicitorGeneral@oag.state.va.us
8047867240
Party name: Randall Mathena
Attorneys for Respondent
Danielle Mary Spinelli
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

danielle.spinelli@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: Lee Boyd Malvo
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Russell Paul Butler
    Counsel of Record
Maryland Crime Victims' Resource Center, Inc.
1001 Prince George's Blvd.
Suite 750
Upper Marlboro, MD 20774

rbutler@mdcrimevictims.org
2403354030
Party name: Maryland Crime Victims' Resource Center, Inc.
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
IGC South, Fifth Floor
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
3172326255
Party name: States of Indiana, Alabama, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Idaho, Louisiana, Montana, Nebraska, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, and Wyoming
Taylor Ann Rausch Meehan
    Counsel of Record
Bartlit Beck LLP
54 W. Hubbard St. Ste. 300
Chicago, IL 60654

taylor.meehan@bartlit-beck.com
3174083650
Party name: Jonathan F. Mitchell and Adam K. Mortara
Kymberlee Claire Stapleton
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

kym.stapleton@cjlf.org
916-446-0345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543