SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-181
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-181
Title:
Larry Elliot Klayman, Petitioner
v.
Stephanie Ann Luck
Docketed:
August 9, 2018
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeals of Ohio, Cuyahoga County
Case Numbers:
(105239)
Decision Date:
October 19, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
November 22, 2017
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
May 9, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Aug 07 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 10, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 26 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 15 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Larry Elliot Klayman
Counsel of Record
Klayman Law Group, P.A.
2020 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.,
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006
leklayman@gmail.com
3105950800
Party name: Larry Klayman
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##