Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1560
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1560
Title:Richard Leland Neal, Petitioner
v.
B. Marc Neal, et al.
Docketed:June 21, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-15612)
   Decision Date:December 19, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 4, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 22, 2019)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 19 2019Brief of respondents B. Marc Neal, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 06 2019Reply of petitioner Richard L. Neal filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard L. Neal6146 N. Blanca Way
Kingman, AZ 86409

Party name: Richard L. Neal
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert L. Sirianni Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Brownstone, P.A.
P.O. Box 2047
Winter Park, FL 32790

Robertsirianni@brownstonelaw.com
(407)-388-1900
Party name: B. Marc Neal, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543