SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-1495 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-1495 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Bryan P. Stirling, Director, South Carolina Department of Corrections, et al., Petitioners
v.
Charles Christopher Williams
Docketed:
May 31, 2019
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-2)
Decision Date:
February 5, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
February 25, 2019
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
May 28 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 1, 2019)
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jun 28 2019
Brief of respondent Charles Christopher Williams in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 12 2019
Reply of petitioners Bryan Stirling, et al. filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 17 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Melody Jane Brown
Counsel of Record
South Carolina Attorney General's Office
Post Office Box 11549
Columbia, SC 29211
mbrown@scag.gov
803-734-3742
Party name: Bryan Stirling, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
William Harry Ehlies II
Counsel of Record
William H. Ehlies, P.A.
310 Mills Ave
Building A, Suite 201
Greenville, SC 29605
hank@ehlieslaw.com
864-232-3503
Party name: Charles Christopher Williams
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##